06/04/2012 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12. | |||
06/01/2012 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |||
06/01/2012 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |||
05/31/2012 | Received from the House without amendments. | |||
05/31/2012 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | |||
05/31/2012 | Called from the calendar. | |||
05/29/2012 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |||
05/24/2012 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |||
05/23/2012 | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House. | |||
05/22/2012 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |