05/07/2012 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/4. | |||
04/24/2012 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |||
04/24/2012 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |||
04/23/2012 | Received from the House without amendments. | |||
04/23/2012 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | |||
04/23/2012 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |||
04/19/2012 | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House. | |||
04/18/2012 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | |||
03/13/2012 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | |||
03/12/2012 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |