LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR16
Action History
LA
Louisiana Senate Bill SCR16
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2012 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SCR16
Action History
05/03/2012
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
05/02/2012
Received in the House from the Senate.
05/01/2012
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House.
04/30/2012
Reported with amendments.
03/13/2012
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
03/12/2012
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.