05/28/2012 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/25. | |||
05/23/2012 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |||
05/23/2012 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |||
05/22/2012 | Received from the House without amendments. | |||
05/22/2012 | Read by title, concurred in. | |||
05/21/2012 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/2012. | |||
05/17/2012 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | |||
05/16/2012 | Reported favorably (10-0). | |||
04/19/2012 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | |||
04/18/2012 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |||
04/17/2012 | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House. | |||
04/16/2012 | Reported with amendments. | |||
03/12/2012 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |