05/21/2012 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/18. | |||
05/15/2012 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |||
05/15/2012 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |||
05/14/2012 | Received from the House without amendments. | |||
05/14/2012 | Read by title, concurred in. | |||
05/07/2012 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/14/2012. | |||
05/02/2012 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | |||
05/01/2012 | Reported favorably (13-0). | |||
03/28/2012 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |||
03/27/2012 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |||
03/27/2012 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | |||
03/26/2012 | Reported favorably. | |||
03/13/2012 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |