04/12/2012 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | |||
03/29/2012 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |||
03/29/2012 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |||
03/28/2012 | Received from the House without amendments. | |||
03/28/2012 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | |||
03/27/2012 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |||
03/26/2012 | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House. | |||
03/21/2012 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |