05/28/2012 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/25. | |||
05/23/2012 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |||
05/23/2012 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |||
05/22/2012 | Received from the House without amendments. | |||
05/22/2012 | Read by title, concurred in. | |||
05/16/2012 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/22/2012. | |||
05/10/2012 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | |||
05/09/2012 | Reported favorably (11-0-1). | |||
04/25/2012 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. | |||
04/24/2012 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |||
04/24/2012 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | |||
04/23/2012 | Reported favorably. | |||
03/27/2012 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. | |||
03/26/2012 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |