|
05/21/2012
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/18.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read by title, concurred in.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/14/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Reported favorably (14-0).
|
|
|
|
04/04/2012
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2012
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2012
|
Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2012
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|