|
05/28/2012
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/25.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Read by title, concurred in by vote of 95 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Reported favorably (11-0).
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Reported favorably (11-0), with the recommendation to recommit to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Discharged from the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Read by title and adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|