04/12/2012 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | |||
04/11/2012 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |||
04/11/2012 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |||
04/10/2012 | Received from the House without amendments. | |||
04/10/2012 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | |||
04/10/2012 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |||
04/09/2012 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | |||
04/04/2012 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |