04/30/2012 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 04/27. | |||
04/17/2012 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |||
04/17/2012 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |||
04/16/2012 | Received from the House without amendments. | |||
04/12/2012 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | |||
04/11/2012 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |||
04/11/2012 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | |||
04/10/2012 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |