|
06/04/2012
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 30 yeas and 4 nays.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Read by title, amended, concurred in by vote of 91 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/1/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Reported with amendments (10-0).
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Reported favorably (15-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|