05/07/2012 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/4. | |||
05/02/2012 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |||
05/02/2012 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |||
05/01/2012 | Received from the House without amendments. | |||
05/01/2012 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | |||
04/30/2012 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |||
04/30/2012 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | |||
04/26/2012 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |