|
06/04/2012
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2012
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2012
|
Read by title, concurred in.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/1/2012.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Reported favorably (14-0).
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|