Louisiana 2012 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR102 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version

                            SLS 12RS-3576	ORIGINAL
Page 1 of 2
Regular Session, 2012
SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 102
BY SENATOR CLAITOR 
SENATE. Recalls SB 755 from committee and orders instrument to calendar on third
reading and final passage.
A RESOLUTION1
To recall Senate Bill No. 755 from the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and2
International Affairs, discharge the committee from further consideration of the3
measure, and order the measure to the calendar on third reading and final passage.4
WHEREAS, on February 28, 2012, Senate Bill No. 185 was prefiled pursuant to the5
Senate Rules of Order; and6
WHEREAS, on March 12, 2012, Senate Bill No. 185 was read by title, the rules7
suspended, and the bill was read a second time and referred to the Committee on Commerce,8
Consumer Protection and International Affairs; and9
WHEREAS, on April 4, 2012, Senate Bill No. 185 was considered by the Committee10
on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs; and 11
WHEREAS, on February 28, 2012, Senate Bill No. 191 was prefiled and under the12
rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and13
International Affairs; and 14
WHEREAS, on April 11, 2012, Senate Bill No. 191 was read by title and15
recommitted to the Committee on Health and Welfare; and16
WHEREAS, on April 25, 2012, Senate Bill No. 191 was reported by substitute and17
on April 26, 2012, the title of the substitute was read and adopted and the substitute became18 SR NO. 102
SLS 12RS-3576	ORIGINAL
Page 2 of 2
Senate Bill No. 755; and 1
WHEREAS, as Rule 13.10(A) of the Senate Rules of Order provides that a substitute2
need not again be referred to a Senate committee, Senate Bill No. 755 was placed on third3
reading and final passage; however, on May 1, 2012, the instrument was recommitted to the4
Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs; and5
WHEREAS, Senator Claitor, the author of the measure, was none too happy with6
said action; and 7
WHEREAS, Rule 13.11 of the Senate Rules of Order provides, in part, that a8
majority of the elected members of the Senate, by motion or resolution, may recall a9
legislative instrument from a committee and discharge the committee from further10
consideration of the bill.11
. THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Senate of the Legislature of Louisiana12
does hereby recall Senate Bill No. 755 from the Committee on Commerce, Consumer13
Protection and International Affairs, discharge the committee from further consideration of14
Senate Bill 755 and, order Senate Bill No. 755 to the calender on third reading and final15
passage.16
The original instrument and the following digest, which constitutes no part
of the legislative instrument, were prepared by Jerry J. Guillot.
DIGEST
Claitor	SR No. 102
Recalls SB 755 from the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International
Affairs, discharges the committee from further consideration of the bill, and orders the bill
to the calendar on third reading and final passage.