LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SR110
Action History
LA
Louisiana Senate Bill SR110
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2012 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR110
Action History
05/28/2012
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/25.
05/17/2012
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted.
05/16/2012
Reported with amendments.
05/09/2012
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
05/08/2012
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.