House
|
06/21/2013
|
Effective date: July 1, 2013.
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2013
|
Signed by the Governor with one or more line-item vetoes. Becomes Act No. 14.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2013
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/7/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2013
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2013
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2013
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 104, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 1 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2013
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Alario, Donahue, and Murray.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Notice the House rejected the Senate amendments; House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
House conferees appointed: Fannin, Kleckley, Harris, Edwards, Katrina Jackson, and Henry.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/04/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2013
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2013
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 1 for 06/01.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 6. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Read by title. Considered in Committee of the Whole, reported with amendments, amendments adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
House floor amendments adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/10/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Made Special Order of the Day No. 1 for 5/9/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Reported with amendments (15-9) (Regular).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2013
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/8/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2013
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2013
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|