Senate | 05/29/2013 | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | ||
House | 05/29/2013 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 102, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/28/2013 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/29/2013. | ||
House | 05/28/2013 | Rules suspended. Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar. | ||
House | 05/28/2013 | Reported favorably (12-0) (Local and Consent). | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 03/22/2013 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/22/2013. | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. | ||
House | 03/18/2013 | Prefiled. |