House | 05/20/2013 | Read by title, withdrawn from the files of the House. | ||
House | 05/20/2013 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Reported by substitute (13-0) (Regular) | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | ||
House | 03/22/2013 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/22/2013. | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | ||
House | 03/20/2013 | Prefiled. |