Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2013
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2013
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/22/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Reported favorably (18-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2013
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/22/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2013
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2013
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|