Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/21/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported favorably (7-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Reported with amendments (15-0) (Regular). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|