Senate | 04/22/2013 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/17/2013. | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | ||
House | 04/11/2013 | Reported with amendments (15-0) (Regular). | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013. | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 03/26/2013 | Prefiled. |