House
|
06/25/2013
|
Effective date: June 25, 2013.
|
|
|
House
|
06/25/2013
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 34.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2013
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2013
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 3 for 06/01.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/15/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/14/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Reported favorably (18-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Read by title.
|
|
|