House
|
06/07/2013
|
Effective date: August 1, 2013.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2013
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 147.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2013
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2013
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/18/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Reported favorably (13-0) (Local and Consent).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|