House | 04/30/2013 | Becomes HB No. 721. | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Reported by substitute (14-0) (Regular) | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | ||
House | 02/22/2013 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/22/2013. | ||
House | 02/20/2013 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | ||
House | 02/20/2013 | Prefiled. |