House
|
06/20/2013
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2013
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2013
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2013
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 65, nays 24. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/13/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/18/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Reported with amendments (15-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2013
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|