Senate | 05/07/2013 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/1/2013. | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Reported with amendments (12-0) (Regular). | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013. | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 03/27/2013 | Prefiled. |