House
|
05/23/2013
|
Read by title, withdrawn from the files of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 54, nays 41. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/21/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Reported with amendments (9-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Reported favorably (8-7) (Regular) To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2013
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2013
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|