Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 77, nays 20. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/6/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Reported favorably (19-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Reported favorably (10-1) (Regular) To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2013
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/22/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2013
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2013
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|