House
|
06/17/2013
|
Effective date: August 1, 2013.
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2013
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 317.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2013
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 85, nays 7, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/4/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Rules suspended. Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 46, nays 43. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/21/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/14/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Reported with amendments (12-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2013
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2013
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|