House
|
06/21/2013
|
Effective date: June 21, 2013.
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2013
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 421.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2013
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2013
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2013
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2013
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 103, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2013
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Riser, Adley, and Alario.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2013
|
House conferees appointed: Robideaux, Jones, and Stuart Bishop.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2013
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2013
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/6/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/5/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/4/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2013
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2013
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 9. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Reported with amendments (19-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Discharged from the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2013
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2013
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|