Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Read by title, House floor amendments adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Reported unfavorably (18-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2013
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2013
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|