House
|
06/20/2013
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2013
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 81, nays 10, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/4/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2013
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2013
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 70, nays 20. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Rules suspended. Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 43, nays 36. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/21/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Reported with amendments (16-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Read by title.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2013
|
Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date.
|
|
|