LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2013 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB53
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HB53
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2013 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HB53
Action History
House
05/10/2013
Becomes HB No. 727.
House
05/09/2013
Reported by substitute (7-2) (Regular)
House
04/18/2013
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
House
04/17/2013
Read by title.
House
02/22/2013
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/22/2013.
House
02/22/2013
Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date.