House
|
06/26/2013
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2013
|
Becomes Act No. 439.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2013
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 7. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2013
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/02/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2013
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 4 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 6. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/7/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Reported without amendments (12-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Reported with amendments (20-0) (Regular). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2013
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2013
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|