House
|
06/10/2013
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2013
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 202.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2013
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2013
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 5. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/28/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Reported favorably (10-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2013
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2013
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|