House
|
05/08/2013
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 18, nays 70. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/8/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/1/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/29/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/22/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Reported with amendments (9-5) (Regular).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2013
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2013
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|