House
|
06/18/2013
|
Effective date: August 1, 2013.
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2013
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 391.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2013
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2013
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2013
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2013
|
Rules suspended. Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Murray, Nevers, and Amedee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
House conferees appointed: Abramson, Huval, and Nancy Landry.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 80, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2013
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/03/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2013
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2013
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2013
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/02/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2013
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/1/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Reported with amendments (11-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2013
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2013
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|