LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2013 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB595
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HB595
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2013 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HB595
Action History
House
04/25/2013
Becomes HB No. 720.
House
04/24/2013
Reported by substitute (11-0) (Regular)
House
04/08/2013
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
House
04/01/2013
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013.
House
03/29/2013
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
House
03/29/2013
Prefiled.