House | 05/22/2013 | Notice removed | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/22/2013. | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Notice given. | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/10/2013 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/15/2013. | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | ||
House | 05/08/2013 | Reported with amendments (6-0) (Regular). | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 04/01/2013 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013. | ||
House | 03/29/2013 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 03/29/2013 | Prefiled. |