House
|
06/02/2013
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 45, nays 57. Failed to pass.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2013
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/2/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/30/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/29/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/28/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 51, nays 36. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/22/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Made Special Order of the day No. 4 for 5/9/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Reported with amendments (15-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Read by title.
|
|
|