House
|
06/21/2013
|
Effective date: January 1, 2014.
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2013
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 427.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2013
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2013
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2013
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 83, nays 9, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2013
|
Rules suspended. Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/4/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2013
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/15/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Reported with amendments (14-0) (Regular).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Read by title.
|
|
|