House
|
06/13/2013
|
Effective date: September 15, 2013.
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2013
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 264.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2013
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 20 yeas and 17 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 70, nays 20. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/24/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 447 reported by the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works (13-0).
|
|
|