Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/30/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2013
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 47, nays 43. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/22/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Reported favorably (9-5) (Regular).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2013
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/1/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2013
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2013
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|