House
|
06/17/2013
|
Effective date: August 1, 2013.
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2013
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 334.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2013
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2013
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 92, nays 1. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/04/2013.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Conference committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2013
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Long, Thompson, and Peacock.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Notice the House rejected the Senate amendments; House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
House conferees appointed: Howard, Dove, and Armes.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Scheduled for concurrence on May 22, 2013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/25/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 109 reported by the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment (14-0).
|
|
|