Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
Senate
05/20/2013
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
House
05/16/2013
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 57, nays 40. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
House
05/14/2013
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/16/2013.
House
05/13/2013
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
House
05/10/2013
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 53 reported by the Committee on Retirement (7-2).