Senate | 05/22/2013 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2013 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/20/2013 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/20/2013. | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Reported with amendments (16-0) (Regular). | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 03/01/2013 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/1/2013. | ||
House | 02/25/2013 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 02/25/2013 | Prefiled. |