House
|
06/17/2013
|
Effective date: August 1, 2013.
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2013
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 301.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2013
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2013
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 93, nays 1. Having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 6/4/2013.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Conference committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2013
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2013
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Kostelka, Morrell, and White.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Notice the House rejected the Senate amendments; House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2013
|
House conferees appointed: Mack, Lopinto, and Hodges.
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2013
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, the House refused to concur in the amendments proposed by the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 5/28/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 4/23/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Reported favorably (8-5) (Regular).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2013
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/8/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2013
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2013
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|