House
|
06/06/2013
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2013
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 6/04/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2013
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|