House
|
06/06/2013
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2013
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2013
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2013
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2013
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 98, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2013
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2013
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 5/29/2013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Reported favorably (8-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|